Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3201 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11 85R20506 CJC-F
22 By: Darby H.B. No. 3201
33 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3201:
44 By: Bohac C.S.H.B. No. 3201
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to the severance tax exemption for oil and gas produced
1010 from certain inactive wells.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 202.056(a)(4), Tax Code, is amended to
1313 read as follows:
1414 (4) "Two-year inactive well" means a well that has not
1515 produced oil or gas in more than one month in the two years
1616 preceding the date of application for severance tax exemption under
1717 this section. The term does not include a well that is:
1818 (A) part of an enhanced oil recovery project, as
1919 defined by Section 89.002, Natural Resources Code; or
2020 (B) drilled but not completed and that does not
2121 have a record of hydrocarbon production reported to the commission.
2222 SECTION 2. Section 202.056, Tax Code, is amended by
2323 amending Subsections (b), (c), (d), (e), (h), and (i) and adding
2424 Subsections (j) and (k) to read as follows:
2525 (b) Hydrocarbons produced from a well qualify for a
2626 five-year [10-year] severance tax exemption if the commission
2727 designates the well as a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
2828 inactive well. The commission may require an applicant to provide
2929 the commission with any relevant information required to administer
3030 this section. The commission may require additional well tests to
3131 determine well capability as the commission [it] deems necessary.
3232 The commission shall notify the comptroller in writing immediately
3333 if the commission [it] determines that the operation of the
3434 [three-year inactive well or] two-year inactive well has been
3535 terminated or if the commission [it] discovers any information that
3636 affects the taxation of the production from the designated well.
3737 (c) [If the commission designates a three-year inactive
3838 well under this section, it shall issue a certificate designating
3939 the well as a three-year inactive well as defined by Subsection
4040 (a)(3) of this section. The commission may not designate a
4141 three-year inactive well under this section after February 29,
4242 1996.] If the commission designates a two-year inactive well under
4343 this section, the commission [it] shall issue a certificate
4444 designating the well as a two-year inactive well [as defined by
4545 Subsection (a)(4) of this section. The commission may not
4646 designate a two-year inactive well under this section after
4747 February 28, 2010].
4848 (d) [An application for three-year inactive well
4949 certification shall be made during the period of September 1, 1993,
5050 through August 31, 1995, to qualify for the tax exemption under this
5151 section.] An application for two-year inactive well certification
5252 must be made to the commission [shall be made during the period
5353 September 1, 1997, through August 31, 2009,] to qualify for the tax
5454 exemption under this section. Hydrocarbons sold after the date of
5555 certification are eligible for the tax exemption.
5656 (e) The commission may revoke a certificate if information
5757 indicates that a certified well was not a [three-year inactive well
5858 or a] two-year inactive well[, as appropriate,] or if other lease
5959 production is credited to the certified well. Upon notice to the
6060 operator from the commission that the certificate for tax exemption
6161 under this section has been revoked, the tax exemption may not be
6262 applied to hydrocarbons sold from that well from the date of
6363 revocation.
6464 (h) If the tax is paid at the full rate provided by Section
6565 201.052(a) or [, 201.052(b),] 202.052(a)[, or 202.052(b)] before
6666 the comptroller approves an application for an exemption provided
6767 for in this chapter, the operator is entitled to a credit against
6868 taxes imposed by this chapter in an amount equal to the tax paid. To
6969 receive a credit, the operator must apply to the comptroller for the
7070 credit before the expiration of the applicable period for filing a
7171 tax refund claim under Section 111.104.
7272 (i) A [Penalties
7373 [(1) Any] person who makes or subscribes any
7474 application, report, or other document and submits the application,
7575 report, or other document [it] to the commission to form the basis
7676 for an application for a tax exemption under this section, knowing
7777 that the application, report, or other document is false or untrue
7878 in a material fact, may be subject to the penalties imposed by
7979 Chapters 85 and 91, Natural Resources Code.
8080 (j) On [(2) Upon] notice from the commission that the
8181 certification for a [three-year inactive well or a] two-year
8282 inactive well has been revoked, the tax exemption shall not apply to
8383 oil or gas production sold after the date of notification. A [Any]
8484 person who violates this subsection is liable to the state for a
8585 civil penalty if the person applies or attempts to apply the tax
8686 exemption allowed by this chapter after the certification for a
8787 [three-year inactive well or a] two-year inactive well is revoked.
8888 The amount of the penalty may not exceed the sum of:
8989 (1) [(A)] $10,000; and
9090 (2) [(B)] the difference between the amount of taxes
9191 paid or attempted to be paid and the amount of taxes due.
9292 (k) [(3)] The attorney general may recover a penalty under
9393 Subsection (j) [Subdivision (2) of this subsection] in a suit
9494 brought on behalf of the state. Venue for the suit is in Travis
9595 County.
9696 SECTION 3. Section 202.056(a)(3), Tax Code, is repealed.
9797 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
9898 an oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
9999 a two-year inactive well on or after the effective date of this Act.
100100 An oil or gas well designated by the Railroad Commission of Texas as
101101 a two-year inactive well, or as a three-year inactive well, before
102102 the effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect
103103 immediately before that date, and the former law is continued in
104104 effect for that purpose.
105105 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.