Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2573
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2069
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2001
|
Senate
|
05/11/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1838
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3391
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1112
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3161
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Burrows
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Vote reconsidered
|
|
Journal Page: 3160
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
1 hr. notice-for reconsideration
|
|
Journal Page: 3145
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Motion to reconsider spread on the Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3115
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3114
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1082
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Failed to pass
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3113
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Raymond
|
Journal Page: 2989
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2988
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2299
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 977
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|