1 | 1 | | By: Raymond H.B. No. 3205 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
5 | 5 | | AN ACT |
---|
6 | 6 | | relating to the regulation of and federal funding for certain |
---|
7 | 7 | | child-care providers. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Section 42.0221, Human Resources Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by amending Subsections (a) and (b) and adding Subsections |
---|
11 | 11 | | (e-1), (e-2), and (e-3) to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 12 | | (a) The committee on licensing standards is composed of nine |
---|
13 | 13 | | [seven] members appointed by the governor as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (1) one member who operates a residential child-care |
---|
15 | 15 | | facility licensed by the department; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) one member who operates a child-placing agency |
---|
17 | 17 | | licensed by the department; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) one member who operates a licensed child-care |
---|
19 | 19 | | facility that provides care for children for less than 24 hours a |
---|
20 | 20 | | day; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (4) one member who is a parent, guardian, or custodian |
---|
22 | 22 | | of a child who uses a facility licensed by the department; |
---|
23 | 23 | | (5) one member who is an expert in the field of child |
---|
24 | 24 | | care and child development; [and] |
---|
25 | 25 | | (6) two members employed by the department who work |
---|
26 | 26 | | with facilities licensed by the department; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | (7) two members who represent child advocacy |
---|
28 | 28 | | organizations. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b) Members of the committee serve two-year terms, with the |
---|
30 | 30 | | terms of [three or] four or five members, as appropriate, expiring |
---|
31 | 31 | | February 1 of each year. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (e-1) The committee shall review and analyze nationwide |
---|
33 | 33 | | best practices of child-care providers and other state standards |
---|
34 | 34 | | related to staff-to-child ratios and group sizes applicable to |
---|
35 | 35 | | nonresidential child-care facilities that provide care for less |
---|
36 | 36 | | than 24 hours a day and make recommendations to the department for |
---|
37 | 37 | | policy and statutory changes related to the ratios and group sizes. |
---|
38 | 38 | | (e-2) From the recommendations provided under Subsection |
---|
39 | 39 | | (e-1), the department shall annually reduce the staff-to-child |
---|
40 | 40 | | ratios and group sizes applicable to nonresidential child-care |
---|
41 | 41 | | facilities that provide care for less than 24 hours a day subject to |
---|
42 | 42 | | the following limitations: |
---|
43 | 43 | | (1) the reduced ratios and group sizes may not be |
---|
44 | 44 | | higher than the ratios and group sizes in the department's proposed |
---|
45 | 45 | | rules published in the Texas Register on June 11, 2010; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (2) ratios may not be reduced by more than three |
---|
47 | 47 | | children per each age group; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | (3) the staff-to-child ratios for children ages 17 |
---|
49 | 49 | | months of age and younger may not be reduced. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (e-3) Subsection (e-2) and this subsection expire September |
---|
51 | 51 | | 1, 2022. |
---|
52 | 52 | | SECTION 2. Not later than October 1, 2017, the governor |
---|
53 | 53 | | shall appoint the nine members to the committee on licensing |
---|
54 | 54 | | standards as provided by Section 42.0221, Human Resources Code, as |
---|
55 | 55 | | amended by this Act. The initial members of the committee on |
---|
56 | 56 | | licensing standards appointed under this section shall draw lots to |
---|
57 | 57 | | determine which members will serve terms expiring February 1, 2018, |
---|
58 | 58 | | and which members will serve terms expiring February 1, 2017. |
---|
59 | 59 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|