E | 06/12/2017 | Effective on 1/1/18 | ||
E | 06/12/2017 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 6064 | |
E | 05/25/2017 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 5573 | |
Senate | 05/24/2017 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2963 | |
House | 05/23/2017 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 4565 | |
House | 05/22/2017 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4575 | |
House | 05/20/2017 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 4000 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Laid before the Senate | Journal Page: 2239 | |
Senate | 05/19/2017 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 1952 | |
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/15/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1762 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2782 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#904 | Journal Page: 2782 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2782 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2782 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2692 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2692 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/19/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/19/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/30/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 03/30/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 980 | |
House | 03/07/2017 | Filed |