House
|
05/10/2017
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3173
|
House
|
05/10/2017
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
CSSB 1630
|
Journal Page: 3172
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Postponed
|
5/10/17 7:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3054
|
House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2980
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2473
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 906
|
House
|
03/07/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|