Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3276 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Oliverson, et al. H.B. No. 3276
 (Senate Sponsor - Taylor of Galveston)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to notice of health benefit plan provider network status
 provided by certain freestanding emergency medical care
 facilities.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 241.252, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (b) and adding Subsection (e) to
 read as follows:
 (b)  A facility described by Section 241.251 shall post
 notice that:
 (1)  states:
 (A) [(1)  that] the facility is a freestanding
 emergency medical care facility;
 (B) [(2)  that] the facility charges rates
 comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility
 fee;
 (C) [(3)  that] a facility or a physician
 providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating
 provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and
 (D) [(4)  that] a physician providing medical
 care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the
 medical care provided to a patient; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  lists the health benefit plans in which the
 facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's
 provider network; or
 (B)  states the facility is not a participating
 provider in any health benefit plan provider network.
 (e)  Notwithstanding Subsection (c), a facility that is a
 participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider
 networks complies with Subsection (b)(2) if the facility:
 (1)  provides notice on the facility's Internet website
 listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider
 network; and
 (2)  provides to a patient written confirmation of
 whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's
 health benefit plan's provider network.
 SECTION 2.  Section 254.155, Health and Safety Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (d) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  A facility shall post notice that:
 (1)  states:
 (A) [(1)  that] the facility is a freestanding
 emergency medical care facility;
 (B) [(2)  that] the facility charges rates
 comparable to a hospital emergency room and may charge a facility
 fee;
 (C) [(3)  that] a facility or a physician
 providing medical care at the facility may not be a participating
 provider in the patient's health benefit plan provider network; and
 (D) [(4)  that] a physician providing medical
 care at the facility may bill separately from the facility for the
 medical care provided to a patient; and
 (2)  either:
 (A)  lists the health benefit plans in which the
 facility is a participating provider in the health benefit plan's
 provider network; or
 (B)  states the facility is not a participating
 provider in any health benefit plan provider network.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), a facility that is a
 participating provider in one or more health benefit plan provider
 networks complies with Subsection (a)(2) if the facility:
 (1)  provides notice on the facility's Internet website
 listing the health benefit plans in which the facility is a
 participating provider in the health benefit plan's provider
 network; and
 (2)  provides to a patient written confirmation of
 whether the facility is a participating provider in the patient's
 health benefit plan's provider network.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *