Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3281 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/22/2017

                    By: Rodriguez of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3281
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 18, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by
 the following vote:  Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish
 homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 373A.003, Local Government Code, is
 amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
 read as follows:
 (a)  This chapter applies to a municipality with a population
 of more than 750,000 that is located in a uniform state service
 region with fewer than 800,000 [550,000] occupied housing units as
 determined by the most recent United States decennial census.
 (a-1)  If this chapter applies to a municipality as provided
 by Subsection (a), the application of this chapter to the
 municipality is not affected if the municipality's population or
 number of occupied housing units changes and the municipality no
 longer meets the population requirement of Subsection (a).
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *