Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3281 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3281
1+By: Rodriguez of Travis (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3281
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3+ May 18, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by
5+ the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 2; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
511 relating to the eligibility of certain municipalities to establish
612 homestead preservation districts and reinvestment zones.
713 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
814 SECTION 1. Section 373A.003, Local Government Code, is
9- amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsections (a-1) and
10- (c) to read as follows:
15+ amended by amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-1) to
16+ read as follows:
1117 (a) This chapter applies to a municipality with a population
1218 of more than 750,000 that is located in a uniform state service
1319 region with fewer than 800,000 [550,000] occupied housing units as
1420 determined by the most recent United States decennial census.
1521 (a-1) If this chapter applies to a municipality as provided
1622 by Subsection (a), the application of this chapter to the
1723 municipality is not affected if the municipality's population or
1824 number of occupied housing units changes and the municipality no
1925 longer meets the population requirement of Subsection (a).
20- (c) Notwithstanding any other law, a municipality to which
21- this chapter applies may not designate a district under this
22- chapter if the municipality has adopted a requirement in any form,
23- including through an ordinance or regulation or as a condition for
24- granting a building permit, that establishes a maximum sales price
25- for a privately produced housing unit or residential building lot.
26- The restriction described by this subsection does not apply to
27- property that is part of an urban land bank program.
2826 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
29- ______________________________ ______________________________
30- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
31- I certify that H.B. No. 3281 was passed by the House on May 9,
32- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 137, Nays 8, 2 present, not
33- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
34- No. 3281 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 123, Nays 20,
35- 2 present, not voting.
36- ______________________________
37- Chief Clerk of the House
38- I certify that H.B. No. 3281 was passed by the Senate, with
39- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 23, Nays
40- 8.
41- ______________________________
42- Secretary of the Senate
43- APPROVED: __________________
44- Date
45- __________________
46- Governor
27+ * * * * *