E
|
06/15/2017
|
Effective on 9/1/17
|
|
|
E
|
06/15/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6065
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6063
|
Senate
|
05/30/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4242
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6059
|
House
|
05/29/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4158
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5955
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#2000
|
Journal Page: 5822
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5821
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6034
|
Senate
|
05/28/2017
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 4128
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Conf. Comm. Report distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/27/2017
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 3877
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5571
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3606
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
Senate
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3507
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/26/2017
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5106
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4814
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2956
|
Senate
|
05/24/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2574
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2019
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1947
|
Senate
|
05/15/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1920
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3492
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1244
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3431
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
2-Tinderholt
|
Journal Page: 3382
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1205
|
Journal Page: 3381
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Amended
|
1-Klick
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3380
|
House
|
05/08/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2646
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Posting rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1481
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 908
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 908
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|