Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3294 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/18/2017

                    By: Parker, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 3294
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
 May 11, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported favorably
 by the following vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 4, 1 present not voting;
 May 18, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the eligibility of certain NASCAR events to receive
 funding through the Major Events Reimbursement Program.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 5A(a)(4), Chapter 1507 (S.B. 456), Acts
 of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999 (Article 5190.14,
 Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), is amended to read as follows:
 (4)  "Event" means a Super Bowl, a National Collegiate
 Athletic Association Final Four tournament game, the National
 Basketball Association All-Star Game, the X Games, the National
 Hockey League All-Star Game, the Major League Baseball All-Star
 Game, a game of the National Collegiate Athletic Association Bowl
 Championship Series or its successor or a National Collegiate
 Athletic Association Division I Football Bowl Subdivision
 postseason playoff or championship game, the National Collegiate
 Athletic Association men's or women's lacrosse championships, a
 World Cup Soccer game, the World Cup soccer tournament, the Major
 League Soccer All-Star Game, the Major League Soccer Cup, the
 Professional Rodeo Cowboys Association National Finals Rodeo, an
 Elite Rodeo Association World Championship, the United States Open
 Championship, the World Games, a national collegiate championship
 of an amateur sport sanctioned by the national governing body of the
 sport that is recognized by the United States Olympic Committee, an
 Olympic activity, including a Junior or Senior activity, training
 program, or feeder program sanctioned by the United States Olympic
 Committee's Community Olympic Development Program, the Amateur
 Athletic Union Junior Olympic Games, a mixed martial arts
 championship, the Breeders' Cup World Championships, a Formula One
 automobile race, the Moto Grand Prix of the United States, the
 National Association for Stock Car Auto Racing (NASCAR) All-Star
 Race, the season-ending Championship Race for the National
 Association for Stock Car Auto Racing (NASCAR), the Academy of
 Country Music Awards, the National Cutting Horse Association Triple
 Crown, a national political convention of the Republican National
 Committee or the Democratic National Committee, a presidential
 general election debate, or the largest event held each year at a
 sports entertainment venue in this state with a permanent seating
 capacity, including grandstand and premium seating, of not less
 than 125,000.  The term includes any activities related to or
 associated with an event.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a request submitted by a local organizing committee, endorsing
 municipality, or endorsing county under Section 5A, Chapter 1507
 (S.B. 456), Acts of the 76th Legislature, Regular Session, 1999
 (Article 5190.14, Vernon's Texas Civil Statutes), on or after the
 effective date of this Act. A request submitted under Section 5A
 before that date is governed by the law in effect on the date the
 request is submitted, and that law is continued in effect for that
 purpose.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *