Senate | 05/23/2017 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 05/23/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Recommitted to committee | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed |