Senate | 05/22/2017 | Referred to Business & Commerce | Journal Page: 2316 | |
Senate | 05/22/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2316 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1698 | |
House | 05/07/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2829 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#963 | Journal Page: 2828 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2828 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2828 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Amended | 1-Kuempel | Journal Page: 2731 |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2731 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1982 | |
House | 04/20/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 1037 | |
House | 04/03/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1037 | |
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed |