Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3342 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/19/2017

                    By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3342
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 19, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3342 By:  Creighton


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the prelicensing education requirements for
 residential mortgage loan originators.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 180.056(h), Finance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (h)  An individual who fails to maintain a residential
 mortgage loan originator license for the period of time established
 by rule of the rulemaking authority [at least five consecutive
 years] must retake the prelicensing education requirements
 prescribed by the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *