1 | | - | H.B. No. 3342 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Parker (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) H.B. No. 3342 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business & |
---|
| 4 | + | Commerce; May 19, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable |
---|
| 5 | + | Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 8, Nays 0; |
---|
| 6 | + | May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3342 By: Creighton |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the prelicensing education requirements for |
---|
6 | 14 | | residential mortgage loan originators. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Section 180.056(h), Finance Code, is amended to |
---|
9 | 17 | | read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (h) An individual who fails to maintain a residential |
---|
11 | 19 | | mortgage loan originator license for the period of time established |
---|
12 | 20 | | by rule of the rulemaking authority [at least five consecutive |
---|
13 | 21 | | years] must retake the prelicensing education requirements |
---|
14 | 22 | | prescribed by the S.A.F.E. Mortgage Licensing Act. |
---|
15 | 23 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect January 1, 2018. |
---|
16 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
17 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
18 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3342 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
19 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
20 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
21 | | - | No. 3342 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
22 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
23 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
24 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
25 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3342 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
26 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
27 | | - | 0. |
---|
28 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
29 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
30 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
31 | | - | Date |
---|
32 | | - | __________________ |
---|
33 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 24 | + | * * * * * |
---|