House | 05/11/2017 | Laid on the table subject to call | ||
House | 05/11/2017 | Companion considered in lieu of | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/04/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/11/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Referred to Insurance | ||
House | 04/03/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/08/2017 | Filed |