Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 13, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 7, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 28, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 19, 2017
Bill April 30, 2017