Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3360 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2017

                            By: Button, et al. (Senate Sponsor - Estes) H.B. No. 3360
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural
 Resources & Economic Development; May 21, 2017, reported
 adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following
 vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 2; May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3360 By:  Estes


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the Economic Incentive Oversight Board.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 490G.001, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subdivision (2-a) and adding Subdivision (2-b) to read as
 follows:
 (2-a)  "Office" means the Texas Economic Development
 and Tourism Office.
 (2-b) "Rural county" means a county with a population of
 less than 60,000.
 SECTION 2.  Sections 490G.002(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a)  The Economic Incentive Oversight Board is an advisory
 body composed of nine members as follows:
 (1)  two public members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives, one of whom must be from a rural county;
 (2)  two public members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, one of whom must be from a rural county;
 (3)  two public members appointed by the comptroller,
 one of whom must hold an advanced degree in economics; and
 (4)  three public members appointed by the governor,
 one of whom must hold an advanced degree in statistics and one of
 whom must hold an advanced degree in economics.
 (b)  A person is ineligible to serve as a member of the board
 if the person has, within the five years preceding the person's
 appointment:
 (1)  served as an officer, director, or executive of an
 entity that received a monetary incentive or an ad valorem tax
 incentive under Chapter 313, Tax Code;
 (2)  accepted compensation to represent a person or
 entity that sought a monetary incentive or an ad valorem tax
 incentive under Chapter 313, Tax Code; or
 (3)  accepted compensation to represent a state agency,
 local government, school district, or economic development
 corporation with the authority to grant a monetary incentive or an
 ad valorem tax incentive under Chapter 313, Tax Code.  [In
 appointing members of the board, each appointing officer shall
 appoint one member who has expertise in the area of economic
 development].
 SECTION 3.  Chapter 490G, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 490G.0055 to read as follows:
 Sec. 490G.0055.  REVIEW OF PROGRAM ESTABLISHED BY TEXAS
 ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT; PERFORMANCE MATRIX. (a) The board shall
 examine the effectiveness, efficiency, and financial impact on this
 state of the ad valorem tax incentive program established by
 Chapter 313, Tax Code, including whether that chapter is being
 implemented by school districts and the comptroller in such a way as
 to:
 (1)  accomplish the purposes of that chapter as
 expressed in Section 313.003 of that chapter; and
 (2)  comply with the intent of the legislature in
 enacting that chapter as expressed in Section 313.004 of that
 chapter.
 (b)  The board shall develop a performance matrix that
 clearly establishes the economic performance indicators, measures,
 and metrics that will guide the board's evaluation of the program.
 (c)  The comptroller shall provide to the board on request
 information concerning the program as necessary to enable the board
 to perform the board's duties under this chapter.
 SECTION 4.  The heading to Section 490G.006, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 490G.006.  SCHEDULE OF REVIEW OF STATE INCENTIVE
 PROGRAMS; RECOMMENDATION TO LEGISLATIVE AUDIT COMMITTEE.
 SECTION 5.  Chapter 490G, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 490G.0065 to read as follows:
 Sec. 490G.0065.  SCHEDULE OF REVIEW OF PROGRAM ESTABLISHED
 BY TEXAS ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT ACT. (a) The board shall develop a
 schedule for the review of the ad valorem tax incentive program
 established by Chapter 313, Tax Code, for the purpose of making
 recommendations concerning the effectiveness and efficiency of the
 program to the office and reporting the findings and
 recommendations resulting from the review to the legislature as
 required by Section 490G.007. The board shall review and make
 findings and recommendations regarding the program according to the
 review schedule.
 (b)  The board, on request, shall provide to the governing
 body of a school district or the comptroller any recommendations
 submitted to the office under Subsection (a) concerning the
 program.
 SECTION 6.  Section 490G.007, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 490G.007.  BIENNIAL REPORT.  Not later than January 1
 of each odd-numbered year, the board shall submit to the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and each
 standing committee of the senate and house of representatives with
 primary jurisdiction over economic development a report containing
 findings and recommendations resulting from each review of state
 incentive programs and funds and of the ad valorem tax incentive
 program established by Chapter 313, Tax Code, conducted by the
 board under this chapter during the preceding two calendar years.
 SECTION 7.  A serving board member who would have been
 ineligible for appointment under Section 490G.002(b) as amended by
 this Act shall cease to be a board member as of the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 8.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *