Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3370 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2017

                            By: Craddick (Senate Sponsor - Hancock) H.B. No. 3370
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
 May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Business &
 Commerce; May 22, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote:  Yeas 8, Nays 0;
 May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3370 By:  Hancock


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to certain disclosures and notices required for certain
 life insurance policies.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 1101, Insurance Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter E to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER E. DISCLOSURES AND NOTICES RELATING TO LIFE INSURANCE
 POLICIES WITH NON-GUARANTEED ELEMENTS
 Sec. 1101.201.  PURPOSE. This subchapter is intended to
 provide standards for disclosures relating to life insurance
 policies subject to this subchapter and to recognize that a purpose
 of those life insurance policies is to provide insurance coverage
 at a lower initial premium than might otherwise be obtainable from
 the insurer if the insurer were not allowed to change the premium
 during the life of the policy.
 Sec. 1101.202.  APPLICABILITY. (a)  This subchapter applies
 to a life insurance policy issued by an insurer, as defined by
 Section 1102.001, that contains non-guaranteed elements that may
 change at the discretion of the insurer.
 (b)  This subchapter does not apply to:
 (1)  group life insurance without separately
 identifiable accounts for insureds; or
 (2)  a life insurance policy in which the insurer
 assumes all risk and contractually guarantees a death benefit in
 exchange for a guaranteed premium set at the time of the policy's
 issuance.
 Sec. 1101.203.  DISCLOSURES AFTER ISSUANCE OF POLICY. (a)
 Subject to Section 1101.204, and unless the change is made pursuant
 to a previously implemented current cost of insurance schedule, if
 an insurer increases a non-guaranteed element in or decreases the
 credited interest rate for a policy after the policy's issuance,
 the insurer must provide a written notice to the policy owner
 disclosing:
 (1)  the non-guaranteed element that is being changed;
 (2)  the value of the non-guaranteed element before and
 after the proposed change;
 (3)  the maximum or minimum guaranteed value, as
 applicable, of the non-guaranteed element stated in the policy, if
 any;
 (4)  the effective date of the change;
 (5)  a comparison of the change to the current and
 maximum or minimum guaranteed elements, as applicable, if any,
 stated in the policy; and
 (6)  the options available to the policy owner under
 the policy.
 (b)  The notice under Subsection (a) must include the
 insurer's phone number and e-mail address and the following
 statement in at least 12-point bold type:
 "IMPORTANT NOTICE: An increase in a non-guaranteed element or
 a decrease in the credited interest rate will have an adverse impact
 on the longevity and value of your policy. You should request an
 illustration of the impact of this change on your policy."
 (c)  Except as provided by this subsection, notice required
 by Subsection (a) must be given not later than the 90th day before
 the date the change is applied.  For a decrease in the credited
 interest rate for a policy, notice required by Subsection (a) may be
 given at the time that the decrease is applied.
 (d)  If a policy owner affirmatively requests a loan, partial
 surrender, or other action on the policy that might impact the
 longevity of the policy, the insurer must provide to the policy
 owner in writing, not later than the 10th day after the date the
 owner makes the request, the insurer's phone number and e-mail
 address and the following statement in at least 12-point bold type:
 "IMPORTANT NOTICE: Your recent request will have an impact on
 the longevity and value of your policy. You should request an
 illustration of the impact of this change on your policy."
 (e)  Regardless of whether any non-guaranteed elements are
 changed, an insurer that issues a policy subject to this subchapter
 must provide to the policy owner at least annually an illustration
 containing elements specified by the commissioner by rule.
 Sec. 1101.204.  NOTICE TO DEPARTMENT OF CERTAIN CHANGES TO
 NON-GUARANTEED ELEMENTS.  (a)  Not later than the 180th day before
 the effective date of an increase in a non-guaranteed element in an
 individual's policy or certificate subject to this subchapter,
 other than an increase pursuant to a previously implemented current
 cost of insurance schedule, the insurer must provide notice to the
 department if:
 (1)  except as provided by Subsection (b), the increase
 in the non-guaranteed element will result in an aggregate increase
 in the cost of insurance rate that is greater than 40 percent of the
 cost of insurance rate for the preceding year; and
 (2)  the increase will be applied to a policy issued in
 this state.
 (b)  The commissioner by rule may adopt a lower percentage
 increase in a cost of insurance rate for which an insurer must
 provide notice to the department under Subsection (a), but the
 percentage adopted may not be lower than 20 percent.
 (c)  The notice under Subsection (a) must include:
 (1)  the specific approved policy form for which the
 insurer will implement the increase;
 (2)  a copy of the disclosure to be provided under
 Section 1101.203 to each owner whose policy was issued in this
 state;
 (3)  information on the classes of owners who will
 receive the disclosure;
 (4)  sufficient information for the department to
 determine if the increase is actuarially justified;
 (5)  if applicable, sufficient information to
 demonstrate compliance with the nonforfeiture values under Chapter
 1105 for the increased premium; and
 (6)  any other information necessary to determine if
 the increase will comply with the standards in this code.
 (d)  Not later than the 60th day after receipt of a notice
 under this section, the commissioner may:
 (1)  disapprove the proposed increase if the
 commissioner determines that the increase is not actuarially
 justified or not in compliance with this code and provide the
 insurer with a description in adequate detail of the changes
 necessary to avoid disapproval; or
 (2)  withdraw approval under Section 1701.055 of the
 applicable individual life insurance policy form.
 (e)  If the commissioner does not take action under
 Subsection (d), the insurer may provide the disclosure required by
 Section 1101.203 and apply the proposed increase in the
 non-guaranteed element in the policy.
 Sec. 1101.205.  RULES. (a)  The commissioner may adopt rules
 as necessary to implement this subchapter.
 (b)  The commissioner by rule may exempt certain types of
 life insurance policies from one or more of the requirements of this
 subchapter.
 SECTION 2.  Subchapter E, Chapter 1101, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, applies only to an increase in a non-guaranteed
 element or a decrease in a credited interest rate that is applied to
 an insurance policy on or after January 1, 2018.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *