Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3407 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 03/08/2017

                            85R11987 MM-D
 By: Thierry H.B. No. 3407


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a task force to address suicide
 prevention at public institutions of higher education.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 51, Education Code, is amended by adding
 Subchapter W-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER W-1.  TASK FORCE TO PREVENT SUICIDE AT INSTITUTIONS OF
 HIGHER EDUCATION
 Sec. 51.861.  DEFINITIONS. In this subchapter:
 (1)  "Institution of higher education" has the meaning
 assigned by Section 61.003.
 (2)  "Task force" means the task force established
 under this subchapter.
 Sec. 51.862.  ESTABLISHMENT OF TASK FORCE. A task force is
 established under this subchapter to develop a strategy to prevent
 suicide at institutions of higher education.
 Sec. 51.863.  TASK FORCE MEMBERSHIP. (a) The task force
 consists of 13 members appointed as follows:
 (1)  two members appointed by the governor;
 (2)  two members appointed by the lieutenant governor;
 (3)  two members appointed by the speaker of the house
 of representatives;
 (4)  four members appointed by the presiding officer of
 the task force;
 (5)  one representative from The University of Texas'
 counseling and mental health center appointed by the chancellor of
 The University of Texas System;
 (6)  one representative from Texas A&M University's
 student counseling services appointed by the chancellor of The
 Texas A&M University System; and
 (7)  one representative of the Department of State
 Health Services appointed by the executive commissioner of the
 Health and Human Services Commission.
 (b)  Members of the task force must be individuals who are:
 (1)  actively involved in the prevention of suicide and
 the improvement of student welfare; or
 (2)  employed by an institution of higher education.
 (c)  Appointments to the task force shall be made without
 regard to the race, color, disability, sex, religion, age, or
 national origin of the appointee.
 (d)  A task force member is not entitled to compensation for
 service on the task force.
 (e)  The presiding officer of the task force is the member
 who represents The University of Texas' counseling and mental
 health center.
 (f)  The task force shall meet at the call of the presiding
 officer. The task force may meet by teleconference.
 (g)  Chapter 2110, Government Code, does not apply to the
 task force.
 Sec. 51.864.  TASK FORCE DUTIES. (a) The task force shall
 identify:
 (1)  all existing programs in the state relating to
 preventing suicide at institutions of higher education; and
 (2)  the programs described by Subdivision (1) that
 receive state money.
 (b)  The task force shall develop recommendations for
 reducing suicide and for improving student welfare at institutions
 of higher education.  In developing recommendations, the task force
 shall:
 (1)  gather information concerning suicide and student
 welfare at institutions of higher education, including information
 regarding:
 (A)  the race, gender, area of study, and year of
 study for students who have committed suicide, attempted to commit
 suicide, or sought services related to suicide from a counseling
 center;
 (B)  protocols on each campus for responding to
 students in distress, intervention, treatment, re-entry, and
 post-crisis intervention;
 (C)  the availability of online resources and
 hotlines;
 (D)  efforts to screen students for behavioral
 health disorders and suicidal ideation;
 (E)  efforts to enforce suicide means restriction
 and reduce access to lethal means;
 (F)  counselor-to-student ratios;
 (G)  student groups raising awareness about
 suicide prevention and behavioral health problems; and
 (H)  social media coping resources, including
 online resources;
 (2)  receive reports and testimony from individuals,
 state and local governmental agencies, community-based
 organizations, and other public and private organizations; and
 (3)  create goals for state policy that would prevent
 suicide and improve student welfare at institutions of higher
 education.
 Sec. 51.865.  SUPPORT AGENCY DUTIES. The Texas Higher
 Education Coordinating Board, the Department of State Health
 Services, The University of Texas System, and The Texas A&M
 University System shall:
 (1)  provide administrative support services to the
 task force;
 (2)  coordinate administrative responsibilities with
 the task force to avoid unnecessary duplication of duties;
 (3)  share the costs of the task force, including
 administrative expenses; and
 (4)  each designate a person to serve as a liaison with
 the task force.
 Sec. 51.866.  CONSULTATION WITH OTHER AGENCIES; PRIVATE
 FOUNDATIONS. (a) The task force shall consult with employees of
 the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board, the Department of
 State Health Services, The University of Texas System, and The
 Texas A&M University System as necessary to accomplish the task
 force's responsibilities under this subchapter.
 (b)  The task force may collaborate as necessary with any
 appropriate state agency, including institutions of higher
 education.
 (c)  The task force may consult with private foundations that
 have made a substantial commitment to the prevention of suicide to
 accomplish the task force's responsibilities under this
 subchapter.
 Sec. 51.867.  REPORT. Not later than December 1, 2018, the
 task force shall prepare and submit to the governor, the lieutenant
 governor, and the speaker of the house of representatives a report
 that includes:
 (1)  a description of the activities of the task force;
 (2)  the findings of the task force on the current state
 of suicide at institutions of higher education;
 (3)  recommendations on best practices for higher
 education policies and protocols for preventing suicide; and
 (4)  any other matter the task force considers
 appropriate.
 Sec. 51.868.  FUNDING; ACCOUNT. (a) The task force shall
 review the funding strategies for the task force and develop
 proposals for expanding the sources of funds available to finance
 the activities of the task force.
 (b)  The task force may accept gifts and grants from
 individuals or private or public organizations and accept federal
 and local funds to support the task force.
 (c)  The suicide prevention task force account is an account
 in the general revenue fund. Money in the account may be
 appropriated only to the task force for the purposes of this
 subchapter. The suicide prevention task force account is exempt
 from the application of Section 403.095, Government Code. The
 account consists of:
 (1)  gifts and grants to the task force;
 (2)  money received by the task force from federal,
 state, or local government; and
 (3)  notwithstanding Section 404.071, Government Code,
 all interest attributable to money held in the account.
 Sec. 51.869.  EXPIRATION. The task force is abolished and
 this subchapter expires September 1, 2019.
 SECTION 2.  The members of the task force shall be appointed
 as required by Section 51.863, Education Code, as added by this Act,
 not later than October 1, 2017.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.