Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Passed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2017
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2017
|
Postponed
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2017
|
Referred to Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|