1 | | - | H.B. No. 3453 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Landgraf (Senate Sponsor - Seliger) H.B. No. 3453 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Intergovernmental Relations; May 17, 2017, reported adversely, |
---|
| 5 | + | with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4, |
---|
| 6 | + | Nays 0, 1 present not voting; May 17, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3453 By: Garcia |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to the regulation of game rooms in certain counties. |
---|
6 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 234.132, Local Government Code, as |
---|
8 | 16 | | amended by Chapters 623 (S.B. 1210) and 1170 (S.B. 866), Acts of the |
---|
9 | 17 | | 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended |
---|
10 | 18 | | to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 19 | | Sec. 234.132. APPLICABILITY. This subchapter applies only |
---|
12 | 20 | | to: |
---|
13 | 21 | | (1) a county that has a population of less than 25,000, |
---|
14 | 22 | | is adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico, and is within 50 miles of an |
---|
15 | 23 | | international border; |
---|
16 | 24 | | (2) a county that has a population of four million or |
---|
17 | 25 | | more; |
---|
18 | 26 | | (3) a county that is adjacent to the Gulf of Mexico and |
---|
19 | 27 | | to a county that has a population of four million or more; [and] |
---|
20 | 28 | | (4) a county located on the Texas-Mexico border that |
---|
21 | 29 | | has a population of less than 300,000 and contains a municipality |
---|
22 | 30 | | with a population of 200,000 or more; |
---|
23 | 31 | | (5) [(3)] a county that has a population of 550,000 or |
---|
24 | 32 | | more and is adjacent to a county described by Subdivision (2); |
---|
25 | 33 | | (6) a county that is located in the Permian Basin |
---|
26 | 34 | | within 25 miles of this state's border with another state of the |
---|
27 | 35 | | United States and has a population of more than 130,000; |
---|
28 | 36 | | (7) a county that is located on this state's border |
---|
29 | 37 | | with Louisiana, has a population of more than 65,000, and is within |
---|
30 | 38 | | 50 miles of a municipality in Louisiana with a population of more |
---|
31 | 39 | | than 150,000; |
---|
32 | 40 | | (8) a county that has a population of more than 200,000 |
---|
33 | 41 | | and less than 220,000; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (9) a county that has a population of more than 1.8 |
---|
35 | 43 | | million and that is adjacent to a county with a population of more |
---|
36 | 44 | | than 2.2 million. |
---|
37 | 45 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
38 | 46 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
39 | 47 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
40 | 48 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
41 | 49 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
44 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3453 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
45 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
46 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
47 | | - | No. 3453 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 6, |
---|
48 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
49 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
50 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
51 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3453 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
52 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
53 | | - | 1. |
---|
54 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
56 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Date |
---|
58 | | - | __________________ |
---|
59 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 50 | + | * * * * * |
---|