Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3481 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 05/12/2017

                    By: Thierry (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3481
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017;
 May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the terms of district courts in Harris County.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 24.012, Government Code, is amended by
 amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as
 follows:
 (a)  Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (a-1)
 and (a-2), notwithstanding any other law, each district court holds
 in each county in the judicial district terms that commence on the
 first Mondays in January and July of each year.  To the extent of a
 conflict between this subsection and a specific provision relating
 to a particular judicial district, this section controls.
 (a-2)  In Harris County each district court holds terms that
 commence on the first Mondays in February, May, August, and
 November of each year.
 SECTION 2.  Section 24.602, Government Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 24.602.  TERMS. Except as provided by Section 24.012,
 the [The] terms of a family district court begin on the first Monday
 in January and the first Monday in July.
 SECTION 3.  Sections 24.112(c), 24.267(d), 24.269(b),
 24.270(b), 24.271(b), 24.272(b), 24.273(c), 24.362(c), 24.363(c),
 24.364(c), 24.365(c), 24.387(c), 24.388(c), 24.406(c), 24.407(c),
 24.409(c), 24.425(c), 24.439(c), 24.440(c), 24.483(c), 24.484(c),
 24.485(c), and 24.497(c), Government Code, are repealed.
 SECTION 4.  This Act takes effect January 1, 2018.
 * * * * *