1 | | - | H.B. No. 3481 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Thierry (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3481 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 12, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 12, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to the terms of district courts in Harris County. |
---|
6 | 12 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
7 | 13 | | SECTION 1. Section 24.012, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
8 | 14 | | amending Subsection (a) and adding Subsection (a-2) to read as |
---|
9 | 15 | | follows: |
---|
10 | 16 | | (a) Except as provided by Subsections [Subsection] (a-1) |
---|
11 | 17 | | and (a-2), notwithstanding any other law, each district court holds |
---|
12 | 18 | | in each county in the judicial district terms that commence on the |
---|
13 | 19 | | first Mondays in January and July of each year. To the extent of a |
---|
14 | 20 | | conflict between this subsection and a specific provision relating |
---|
15 | 21 | | to a particular judicial district, this section controls. |
---|
16 | 22 | | (a-2) In Harris County each district court holds terms that |
---|
17 | 23 | | commence on the first Mondays in February, May, August, and |
---|
18 | 24 | | November of each year. |
---|
19 | 25 | | SECTION 2. Section 24.602, Government Code, is amended to |
---|
20 | 26 | | read as follows: |
---|
21 | 27 | | Sec. 24.602. TERMS. Except as provided by Section 24.012, |
---|
22 | 28 | | the [The] terms of a family district court begin on the first Monday |
---|
23 | 29 | | in January and the first Monday in July. |
---|
24 | 30 | | SECTION 3. Sections 24.112(c), 24.267(d), 24.269(b), |
---|
25 | 31 | | 24.270(b), 24.271(b), 24.272(b), 24.273(c), 24.362(c), 24.363(c), |
---|
26 | 32 | | 24.364(c), 24.365(c), 24.387(c), 24.388(c), 24.406(c), 24.407(c), |
---|
27 | 33 | | 24.409(c), 24.425(c), 24.439(c), 24.440(c), 24.483(c), 24.484(c), |
---|
28 | 34 | | 24.485(c), and 24.497(c), Government Code, are repealed. |
---|
29 | | - | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
30 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
31 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
32 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3481 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
33 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
34 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
35 | | - | No. 3481 on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 131, Nays 0, |
---|
36 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
37 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
38 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
39 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3481 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
40 | | - | amendments, on May 18, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
41 | | - | 0. |
---|
42 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
43 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
44 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
45 | | - | Date |
---|
46 | | - | __________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 35 | + | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2018. |
---|
| 36 | + | * * * * * |
---|