1 | | - | H.B. No. 3484 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Paddie (Senate Sponsor - Hughes) H.B. No. 3484 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Natural |
---|
| 4 | + | Resources & Economic Development; May 18, 2017, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 7, Nays 2, 2 present not voting; May 18, 2017, sent to |
---|
| 7 | + | printer.) |
---|
| 8 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 9 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3484 By: RodrÃguez |
---|
4 | 13 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 14 | | relating to the use of municipal hotel occupancy tax revenue by |
---|
6 | 15 | | certain municipalities. |
---|
7 | 16 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 17 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 351, Tax Code, is amended |
---|
9 | 18 | | by adding Section 351.1079 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 19 | | Sec. 351.1079. ALLOCATION OF REVENUE FOR SPORTS FACILITIES |
---|
11 | 20 | | AND FIELDS BY CERTAIN MUNICIPALITIES. (a) This section applies |
---|
12 | 21 | | only to a municipality that has a population of at least 6,000 and |
---|
13 | 22 | | that is the county seat of a county that: |
---|
14 | 23 | | (1) borders the State of Louisiana; |
---|
15 | 24 | | (2) is bisected by a United States highway; and |
---|
16 | 25 | | (3) has a population of 75,000 or less. |
---|
17 | 26 | | (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of this chapter and |
---|
18 | 27 | | subject to Subsection (c), a municipality to which this section |
---|
19 | 28 | | applies may use all or any portion of the revenue derived from the |
---|
20 | 29 | | municipal hotel occupancy tax to construct, improve, maintain, and |
---|
21 | 30 | | operate sports facilities and fields for the purpose of promoting |
---|
22 | 31 | | tourism and the convention and hotel industry. |
---|
23 | 32 | | (c) A municipality to which this section applies may use |
---|
24 | 33 | | revenue derived from the municipal hotel occupancy tax to: |
---|
25 | 34 | | (1) maintain or operate sports facilities and fields |
---|
26 | 35 | | only if the conditions specified by Sections 351.101(a)(7)(A) and |
---|
27 | 36 | | (C) are met; and |
---|
28 | 37 | | (2) improve a sports facility or field only if the |
---|
29 | 38 | | requirements of Sections 351.101(a)(7)(A) and (C) are met and the |
---|
30 | 39 | | municipality complies with Section 351.1076. |
---|
31 | 40 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
32 | 41 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
33 | 42 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
34 | 43 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
35 | 44 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
36 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
37 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
38 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3484 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
39 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 139, Nays 4, 2 present, not |
---|
40 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
41 | | - | No. 3484 on May 21, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 126, Nays 11, |
---|
42 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
45 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3484 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
46 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 26, Nays |
---|
47 | | - | 5. |
---|
48 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
49 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
50 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
51 | | - | Date |
---|
52 | | - | __________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 45 | + | * * * * * |
---|