Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3494 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-85R26760 KKR-F
2- By: Shine, Villalba, et al. H.B. No. 3494
3- Substitute the following for H.B. No. 3494:
4- By: Miller C.S.H.B. No. 3494
1+85R2857 KKR-D
2+ By: Shine H.B. No. 3494
53
64
75 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
86 AN ACT
97 relating to a demonstration program for real-time processing of
108 workers' compensation authorizations of payment for medical
119 services and medical bills.
1210 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1311 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 412, Labor Code, is
1412 amended by adding Section 412.0129 to read as follows:
1513 Sec. 412.0129. AUTHORIZATION OF PAYMENT FOR MEDICAL
1614 SERVICES AND MEDICAL BILLING REAL-TIME PROCESSING DEMONSTRATION
17- PROGRAM. (a) The office may develop and implement a demonstration
18- program for processing workers' compensation authorizations of
19- payment for medical services and medical bills in real time if the
20- office determines that the program would be cost-effective.
15+ PROGRAM. (a) The office shall develop and implement a
16+ demonstration program for processing workers' compensation
17+ authorizations of payment for medical services and medical bills in
18+ real-time.
2119 (b) The demonstration program described by Subsection (a)
2220 must include:
23- (1) a secure single platform, Internet-based portal
24- for use by the office, state agencies, injured employees, and
25- health care providers;
21+ (1) a secure single platform, web-based portal for use
22+ by the office, state agencies, injured employees, and health care
23+ providers;
2624 (2) the ability to collect, input, and transmit
2725 administrative and clinical data, including:
2826 (A) patient information;
2927 (B) provider contracts;
3028 (C) treatment guidelines; and
3129 (D) other information the office considers
3230 necessary for processing authorizations and medical bills;
3331 (3) an automated process to streamline requests for
3432 authorizations of payment for medical services and peer reviews at
3533 the point of care; and
36- (4) return-to-work best practices for workers'
34+ (4) return to work best practices for workers'
3735 compensation claims, including complex case management.
38- (c) The workers' compensation research and evaluation group
39- shall assist the office in identifying and adopting measures for
36+ (c) The office shall work with the workers' compensation
37+ research and evaluation group to identify and adopt measures for
4038 evaluating the demonstration program.
4139 (d) The evaluation period for the demonstration program
4240 shall end on June 30, 2020.
43- (e) If the office implements a demonstration program under
44- this section, not later than December 31, 2020, the office shall
41+ (e) Not later than December 31, 2020, the office shall
4542 provide to the board a report that:
4643 (1) evaluates the program, including any effects of
4744 the program on administrative cost savings; and
4845 (2) recommends whether to use the process implemented
4946 under the program on a permanent basis.
5047 (f) If the report of the demonstration program under
5148 Subsection (e) indicates that administrative cost savings are
5249 achieved by the process implemented under the program, the board
5350 may adopt and use the process on a permanent basis.
5451 (g) This section expires September 1, 2021.
55- SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2018, the State Office
56- of Risk Management shall make a determination as to whether the
57- demonstration program described by Section 412.0129, Labor Code, as
58- added by this Act, would be cost-effective. If the office
59- determines the program would be cost-effective and decides to
60- implement the program, the office shall fully implement the program
61- not later than January 1, 2019.
52+ SECTION 2. (a) Not later than January 1, 2018, the State
53+ Office of Risk Management shall begin developing the demonstration
54+ program under Section 412.0129, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
55+ (b) Not later than January 1, 2019, the State Office of Risk
56+ Management shall fully implement the demonstration program
57+ developed under Section 412.0129, Labor Code, as added by this Act.
6258 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
6359 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
6460 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
6561 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
6662 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.