Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3496 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 8, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 26, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill May 2, 2017