1 | | - | H.B. No. 3521 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Lambert, Thompson of Brazoria, Miller H.B. No. 3521 |
---|
| 2 | + | (Senate Sponsor - Buckingham) |
---|
| 3 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 4 | + | May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Veteran |
---|
| 5 | + | Affairs & Border Security; May 18, 2017, reported favorably by the |
---|
| 6 | + | following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 18, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to the issuance of specialty license plates for certain |
---|
6 | 13 | | veterans. |
---|
7 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Section 504.202(e-1), Transportation Code, as |
---|
9 | 16 | | amended by Chapters 708 (H.B. 1128) and 716 (H.B. 1273), Acts of the |
---|
10 | 17 | | 84th Legislature, Regular Session, 2015, is reenacted and amended |
---|
11 | 18 | | to read as follows: |
---|
12 | 19 | | (e-1) Other than license plates issued under Subsection |
---|
13 | 20 | | (h), license plates issued under this section may include, on |
---|
14 | 21 | | request: |
---|
15 | 22 | | (1) the emblem of the veteran's branch of service; or |
---|
16 | 23 | | (2) one emblem from another license plate to which the |
---|
17 | | - | person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.309, 504.311, |
---|
18 | | - | 504.312, 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316, 504.3161, |
---|
19 | | - | 504.318, 504.319, or 504.320. |
---|
| 24 | + | person is entitled under Section 504.308, 504.311, 504.312, |
---|
| 25 | + | 504.313, 504.3135, 504.314, 504.315, 504.316, 504.3161, 504.318, |
---|
| 26 | + | 504.319, or 504.320. |
---|
20 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Subchapter D, Chapter 504, Transportation Code, |
---|
21 | 28 | | is amended by adding Section 504.3161 to read as follows: |
---|
22 | 29 | | Sec. 504.3161. MILITARY SPECIALTY LICENSE PLATES FOR |
---|
23 | 30 | | RECIPIENTS OF CERTAIN MILITARY CAMPAIGN AND SERVICE AWARDS. The |
---|
24 | 31 | | department shall issue specialty license plates for recipients of |
---|
25 | 32 | | the following military awards that include the name of the award: |
---|
26 | 33 | | (1) the Armed Forces Expeditionary Medal; |
---|
27 | 34 | | (2) the Armed Forces Service Medal; |
---|
28 | 35 | | (3) the Navy Expeditionary Medal; |
---|
29 | 36 | | (4) the Global War on Terrorism Expeditionary Medal; |
---|
30 | 37 | | (5) the Global War on Terrorism Service Medal; |
---|
31 | 38 | | (6) the Marine Corps Expeditionary Medal; |
---|
32 | 39 | | (7) the Merchant Marine Expeditionary Medal; |
---|
33 | 40 | | (8) the Kosovo Campaign Medal; and |
---|
34 | 41 | | (9) the Inherent Resolve Campaign Medal. |
---|
35 | 42 | | SECTION 3. To the extent of any conflict, this Act prevails |
---|
36 | 43 | | over another Act of the 85th Legislature, Regular Session, 2017, |
---|
37 | 44 | | relating to nonsubstantive additions to and corrections in enacted |
---|
38 | 45 | | codes. |
---|
39 | 46 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
40 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
41 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
42 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3521 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
43 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
44 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
45 | | - | No. 3521 on May 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, |
---|
46 | | - | 1 present, not voting. |
---|
47 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
49 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3521 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
50 | | - | amendments, on May 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
51 | | - | 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
52 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
53 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
54 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
55 | | - | Date |
---|
56 | | - | __________________ |
---|
57 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 47 | + | * * * * * |
---|