Senate | 05/12/2017 | Referred to Health & Human Services | ||
Senate | 05/12/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 05/09/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/30/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/28/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Human Services | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |