Senate | 05/16/2017 | Referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 05/16/2017 | Read first time | ||
Senate | 05/01/2017 | Received from the House | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported engrossed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 3rd time | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Passed to engrossment | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Withdrawn from calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2017 | Vote reconsidered | ||
House | 04/18/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/12/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/05/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Referred to Ways & Means | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |