Texas 2017 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3574 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/29/2017

                    H.B. No. 3574


 AN ACT
 relating to the allocation of low income housing tax credits.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  (a)  Section 2306.6710(a), Government Code, is
 amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In evaluating an application, the department shall
 determine whether the application satisfies the threshold criteria
 required by the board in the qualified allocation plan.
 Educational Quality may be considered by the department as part of
 the threshold criteria but shall not be considered by the
 department as a scoring factor.  The department shall reject and
 return to the applicant any application that fails to satisfy the
 threshold criteria.
 (b)  Effective September 1, 2019, Section 2306.6710(a),
 Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
 (a)  In evaluating an application, the department shall
 determine whether the application satisfies the threshold criteria
 required by the board in the qualified allocation plan. The
 department shall reject and return to the applicant any application
 that fails to satisfy the threshold criteria.
 SECTION 2.  The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to an application for low income housing tax credits that is
 submitted to the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
 during an application cycle that is based on the 2018 qualified
 allocation plan or a subsequent plan adopted by the governing board
 of the department under Section 2306.67022, Government Code. An
 application that is submitted during an application cycle that is
 based on an earlier qualified allocation plan is governed by the law
 in effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former
 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3.  Not later than September 1, 2019, the department
 shall report the outcome of considering Educational
 Quality in
 threshold and not as a scoring factor in an application.
 SECTION 4.  Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3574 was passed by the House on May 9,
 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 133, Nays 12, 2 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 3574 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 97, Nays 48,
 2 present, not voting, and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 154
 authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 3574 on May 28, 2017, by
 the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 3574 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote:  Yeas 28, Nays
 3, and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 154 authorizing certain
 corrections in H.B. No. 3574 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:
 Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor