Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3574 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3574
1+By: Collier (Senate Sponsor - Menéndez) H.B. No. 3574
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3+ May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Intergovernmental Relations; May 22, 2017, reported adversely,
5+ with favorable Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 4,
6+ Nays 3; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3574 By: Menéndez
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to the allocation of low income housing tax credits.
614 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
7- SECTION 1. (a) Section 2306.6710(a), Government Code, is
8- amended to read as follows:
15+ SECTION 1. SECTION 1. Section 2306.6710(a), Government
16+ Code, is amended to read as follows:
917 (a) In evaluating an application, the department shall
1018 determine whether the application satisfies the threshold criteria
1119 required by the board in the qualified allocation plan.
1220 Educational Quality may be considered by the department as part of
1321 the threshold criteria but shall not be considered by the
1422 department as a scoring factor. The department shall reject and
1523 return to the applicant any application that fails to satisfy the
1624 threshold criteria.
17- (b) Effective September 1, 2019, Section 2306.6710(a),
18- Government Code, is amended to read as follows:
19- (a) In evaluating an application, the department shall
20- determine whether the application satisfies the threshold criteria
21- required by the board in the qualified allocation plan. The
22- department shall reject and return to the applicant any application
23- that fails to satisfy the threshold criteria.
24- SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
25- to an application for low income housing tax credits that is
26- submitted to the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs
27- during an application cycle that is based on the 2018 qualified
28- allocation plan or a subsequent plan adopted by the governing board
29- of the department under Section 2306.67022, Government Code. An
25+ SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act expires on
26+ August 31, 2019, and thereafter reverts to the law in effect prior
27+ to the enactment of these changes. This change applies only to an
28+ application for low income housing tax credits that is submitted to
29+ the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs during an
30+ application cycle that is based on the 2018 qualified allocation
31+ plan or a subsequent plan adopted by the governing board of the
32+ department under Section 2306.67022, Government Code. An
3033 application that is submitted during an application cycle that is
3134 based on an earlier qualified allocation plan is governed by the law
3235 in effect on the date the application cycle began, and the former
3336 law is continued in effect for that purpose.
3437 SECTION 3. Not later than September 1, 2019, the department
35- shall report the outcome of considering Educational
36- Quality in
37- threshold and not as a scoring factor in an application.
38- SECTION 4. Except as otherwise provided by this Act, this
39- Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
40- ______________________________ ______________________________
41- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
42- I certify that H.B. No. 3574 was passed by the House on May 9,
43- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 133, Nays 12, 2 present, not
44- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
45- No. 3574 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 97, Nays 48,
46- 2 present, not voting, and that the House adopted H.C.R. No. 154
47- authorizing certain corrections in H.B. No. 3574 on May 28, 2017, by
48- the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0, 2 present, not voting.
49- ______________________________
50- Chief Clerk of the House
51- I certify that H.B. No. 3574 was passed by the Senate, with
52- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
53- 3, and that the Senate adopted H.C.R. No. 154 authorizing certain
54- corrections in H.B. No. 3574 on May 28, 2017, by the following vote:
55- Yeas 31, Nays 0.
56- ______________________________
57- Secretary of the Senate
58- APPROVED: __________________
59- Date
60- __________________
61- Governor
38+ shall report the outcome of considering Education Quality in
39+ threshold and not as a scoring factor in an application
40+ SECTION 4. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
41+ * * * * *