Senate | 05/09/2017 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/09/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1760 | |
Senate | 05/08/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1692 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3026 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2817 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#946 | Journal Page: 2816 |
House | 05/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 2816 | |
House | 05/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2816 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2721 | |
House | 05/05/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2721 | |
House | 05/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/17/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/24/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/23/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 866 | |
House | 03/20/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/20/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/13/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 338 | |
House | 11/15/2016 | Filed |