Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3632 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3632
1+By: Moody (Senate Sponsor - Rodríguez) H.B. No. 3632
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3+ May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
5+ Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
410 AN ACT
5- relating to notice of an extension of the timeline for a parent to
6- request a special education impartial due process hearing in
7- certain circumstances.
11+ relating to extension of the timeline for a parent to request a
12+ special education impartial due process hearing in certain
13+ circumstances.
814 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
915 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 29, Education Code, is
1016 amended by adding Section 29.0163 to read as follows:
11- Sec. 29.0163. PROTECTION OF THE RIGHTS OF MILITARY FAMILIES
12- WITH CHILDREN WITH DISABILITIES. (a) In this section,
17+ Sec. 29.0163. EXTENDED TIMELINE TO REQUEST SPECIAL
18+ EDUCATION DUE PROCESS HEARING. (a) In this section,
1319 "servicemember" means a member of:
1420 (1) the armed forces;
1521 (2) the commissioned corps of the National Oceanic and
1622 Atmospheric Administration; or
17- (3) the Commissioned Corps of the United States Public
18- Health Service.
19- (b) The agency must include in the notice of procedural
20- safeguards that the statute of limitations for the parent of a
21- student to request an impartial due process hearing under 20 U.S.C.
22- Section 1415(b) may be tolled if the parent is an active-duty
23- servicemember and 50 U.S.C. Section 3936 applies to the parent.
24- (c) The commissioner shall adopt rules to implement this
25- section.
26- SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
27- a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
28- provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
29- Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
30- Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
31- ______________________________ ______________________________
32- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
33- I certify that H.B. No. 3632 was passed by the House on May 9,
34- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, 2 present, not
35- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
36- No. 3632 on May 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
37- 2 present, not voting.
38- ______________________________
39- Chief Clerk of the House
40- I certify that H.B. No. 3632 was passed by the Senate, with
41- amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 28, Nays
42- 3.
43- ______________________________
44- Secretary of the Senate
45- APPROVED: __________________
46- Date
47- __________________
48- Governor
23+ (3) the commissioned corps of the Public Health
24+ Service.
25+ (b) The timeline for the parent of a student to request an
26+ impartial due process hearing under 20 U.S.C. Section 1415(b) does
27+ not apply if:
28+ (1) the parent is a servicemember and is entitled to a
29+ tolling of statutes of limitation under 50 U.S.C. Section 3936(a);
30+ or
31+ (2) the parent was prevented from requesting the
32+ hearing as provided under 20 U.S.C. Section 1415(f)(3)(D).
33+ SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
34+ * * * * *