Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3649 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3649
1+By: Herrero, Guillen (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa) H.B. No. 3649
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 8, 2017;
3+ May 17, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State
4+ Affairs; May 21, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
5+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
6+ May 21, 2017, sent to printer.)
7+Click here to see the committee vote
8+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3649 By: Hughes
29
310
11+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
412 AN ACT
513 relating to confidential communications of victims of certain
614 family violence offenses.
715 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
816 SECTION 1. The heading to Subtitle C, Title 4, Family Code,
917 is amended to read as follows:
1018 SUBTITLE C. [REPORTING] FAMILY VIOLENCE REPORTING AND SERVICES
1119 SECTION 2. Subtitle C, Title 4, Family Code, is amended by
1220 adding Chapter 93 to read as follows:
1321 CHAPTER 93. CONFIDENTIAL AND PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS
1422 Sec. 93.001. DEFINITIONS. In this chapter:
1523 (1) "Advocate" means a person who has at least 20 hours
1624 of training in assisting victims of family violence and is an
1725 employee or volunteer of a family violence center.
1826 (2) "Family violence center" means a public or private
1927 nonprofit organization that provides, as its primary purpose,
2028 services to victims of family violence, including the services
2129 described by Section 51.005(b)(3), Human Resources Code.
2230 (3) "Victim" has the meaning assigned to "victim of
2331 family violence" by Section 51.002, Human Resources Code.
2432 Sec. 93.002. CONFIDENTIAL COMMUNICATIONS. A written or
2533 oral communication between an advocate and a victim made in the
2634 course of advising, advocating for, counseling, or assisting the
2735 victim is confidential and may not be disclosed.
2836 Sec. 93.003. PRIVILEGED COMMUNICATIONS. (a) A victim has a
2937 privilege to refuse to disclose and to prevent another from
3038 disclosing a confidential communication described by Section
3139 93.002.
3240 (b) The privilege may be claimed by:
3341 (1) a victim or a victim's attorney on a victim's
3442 behalf;
3543 (2) a parent, guardian, or conservator of a victim
3644 under 18 years of age; or
3745 (3) an advocate or a family violence center on a
3846 victim's behalf.
3947 Sec. 93.004. EXCEPTIONS. (a) A communication that is
4048 confidential under this chapter may be disclosed only:
4149 (1) to another individual employed by or volunteering
4250 for a family violence center for the purpose of furthering the
4351 advocacy process;
4452 (2) for the purpose of seeking evidence that is
4553 admissible under Article 38.49, Code of Criminal Procedure,
4654 following an in camera review and a determination that the
4755 communication is admissible under that article;
4856 (3) to other persons in the context of a support group
4957 or group counseling in which a victim is a participant; or
5058 (4) for the purposes of making a report under Chapter
5159 261 of this code or Section 48.051, Human Resources Code.
5260 (b) Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the Texas Rules of
5361 Evidence govern the disclosure of a communication that is
5462 confidential under this chapter in a criminal or civil proceeding
5563 by an expert witness who relies on facts or data from the
5664 communication to form the basis of the expert's opinion.
5765 (c) If the family violence center, at the request of the
5866 victim, discloses a communication privileged under this chapter for
5967 the purpose of a criminal or civil proceeding, the family violence
6068 center shall disclose the communication to all parties to that
6169 criminal or civil proceeding.
6270 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
63- ______________________________ ______________________________
64- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
65- I certify that H.B. No. 3649 was passed by the House on May 6,
66- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 0, 2 present, not
67- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
68- No. 3649 on May 25, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 0,
69- 2 present, not voting.
70- ______________________________
71- Chief Clerk of the House
72- I certify that H.B. No. 3649 was passed by the Senate, with
73- amendments, on May 23, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
74- 0.
75- ______________________________
76- Secretary of the Senate
77- APPROVED: __________________
78- Date
79- __________________
80- Governor
71+ * * * * *