House | 05/08/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2017 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Agriculture & Livestock | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/09/2017 | Filed |