Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3675 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3675
1+By: Paddie, Raymond, Rose H.B. No. 3675
2+ (Senate Sponsor - Hinojosa)
3+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 3, 2017;
4+ May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on Health &
5+ Human Services; May 22, 2017, reported adversely, with favorable
6+ Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 9, Nays 0;
7+ May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
8+Click here to see the committee vote
9+ COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3675 By: Watson
210
311
12+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
413 AN ACT
514 relating to the provision of eye health care by certain
615 professionals and institutions as providers in the Medicaid managed
716 care program.
817 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
918 SECTION 1. Section 32.072(a), Human Resources Code, is
1019 amended to read as follows:
1120 (a) Notwithstanding any other law, a recipient of medical
1221 assistance is entitled to:
1322 (1) select an ophthalmologist or therapeutic
1423 optometrist who is a medical assistance provider to provide eye
1524 health care services, other than surgery, that are within the scope
1625 of:
1726 (A) services provided under the medical
1827 assistance program; and
1928 (B) the professional specialty practice for
2029 which the ophthalmologist or therapeutic optometrist is licensed
2130 [and credentialed]; and
2231 (2) have direct access to the selected ophthalmologist
2332 or therapeutic optometrist for the provision of the nonsurgical
2433 services without any requirement that the patient or
2534 ophthalmologist or therapeutic optometrist [to] obtain:
2635 (A) a referral from a primary care physician or
2736 other gatekeeper or health care coordinator; or
2837 (B) any other prior authorization or
2938 precertification.
3039 SECTION 2. Subchapter B, Chapter 531, Government Code, is
3140 amended by adding Section 531.021191 to read as follows:
3241 Sec. 531.021191. MEDICAID ENROLLMENT OF CERTAIN EYE HEALTH
3342 CARE PROVIDERS. (a) This section applies only to:
3443 (1) an optometrist who is licensed by the Texas
3544 Optometry Board;
3645 (2) a therapeutic optometrist who is licensed by the
3746 Texas Optometry Board;
3847 (3) an ophthalmologist who is licensed by the Texas
3948 Medical Board; and
4049 (4) an institution of higher education that provides
4150 an accredited program for:
4251 (A) training as a Doctor of Optometry or an
4352 optometrist residency; or
4453 (B) training as an ophthalmologist or an
4554 ophthalmologist residency.
4655 (b) The commission may not prevent a provider to whom this
4756 section applies from enrolling as a Medicaid provider if the
4857 provider:
4958 (1) either:
5059 (A) joins an established practice of a health
5160 care provider or provider group that has a contract with a managed
5261 care organization to provide health care services to recipients
5362 under Chapter 533; or
5463 (B) is employed by or otherwise compensated for
5564 providing training at an institution of higher education described
5665 by Subsection (a)(4);
5766 (2) applies to be an enrolled provider under Medicaid;
5867 (3) if applicable, complies with the requirements of
5968 the contract between the provider or the provider's group and the
6069 applicable managed care organization; and
6170 (4) complies with all other applicable requirements
6271 related to being a Medicaid provider.
6372 (c) The commission may not prevent an institution of higher
6473 education from enrolling as a Medicaid provider if the institution:
6574 (1) has a contract with a managed care organization to
6675 provide health care services to recipients under Chapter 533;
6776 (2) applies to be an enrolled provider under Medicaid;
6877 (3) complies with the requirements of the contract
6978 between the provider and the applicable managed care organization;
7079 and
7180 (4) complies with all other applicable requirements
7281 related to being a Medicaid provider.
7382 SECTION 3. Subchapter A, Chapter 533, Government Code, is
7483 amended by adding Section 533.0067 to read as follows:
7584 Sec. 533.0067. EYE HEALTH CARE SERVICE PROVIDERS. Subject
7685 to Section 32.047, Human Resources Code, but notwithstanding any
7786 other law, the commission shall require that each managed care
7887 organization that contracts with the commission under any Medicaid
7988 managed care model or arrangement to provide health care services
8089 to recipients in a region include in the organization's provider
8190 network each optometrist, therapeutic optometrist, and
8291 ophthalmologist described by Section 531.021191(b)(1)(A) or (B)
8392 and an institution of higher education described by Section
8493 531.021191(a)(4) in the region who:
8594 (1) agrees to comply with the terms and conditions of
8695 the organization;
8796 (2) agrees to accept the prevailing provider contract
8897 rate of the organization;
8998 (3) agrees to abide by the standards of care required
9099 by the organization; and
91100 (4) is an enrolled provider under Medicaid.
92101 SECTION 4. (a) The Health and Human Services Commission
93102 shall, in a contract between the commission and a Medicaid managed
94103 care organization under Chapter 533, Government Code, that is
95104 entered into or renewed on or after the effective date of this Act,
96105 require that the managed care organization comply with Section
97106 533.0067, Government Code, as added by this Act.
98107 (b) The Health and Human Services Commission shall seek to
99108 amend each contract entered into with a Medicaid managed care
100109 organization under Chapter 533, Government Code, before the
101110 effective date of this Act to require those managed care
102111 organizations to comply with Section 533.0067, Government Code, as
103112 added by this Act. To the extent of a conflict between Section
104113 533.0067, Government Code, as added by this Act, and a provision of
105114 a contract with a managed care organization entered into before the
106115 effective date of this Act, the contract provision prevails.
107116 SECTION 5. This Act may not be construed as authorizing or
108117 requiring implementation of Medicaid managed care delivery models
109118 in regions in this state in which those models are not used on the
110119 effective date of this Act for the delivery of Medicaid services.
111120 SECTION 6. If before implementing any provision of this Act
112121 a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a
113122 federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision,
114123 the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or
115124 authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the
116125 waiver or authorization is granted.
117126 SECTION 7. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
118- ______________________________ ______________________________
119- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
120- I certify that H.B. No. 3675 was passed by the House on May 3,
121- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 2 present, not
122- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
123- No. 3675 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
124- 2
125- present, not voting.
126- ______________________________
127- Chief Clerk of the House
128- I certify that H.B. No. 3675 was passed by the Senate, with
129- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
130- 0.
131- ______________________________
132- Secretary of the Senate
133- APPROVED: __________________
134- Date
135- __________________
136- Governor
127+ * * * * *