Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3727 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 15, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 4, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 27, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 17, 2017
Bill May 1, 2017