1 | | - | H.B. No. 3735 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Frank, et al. (Senate Sponsor - RodrÃguez) H.B. No. 3735 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 15, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 15, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 19, 2017, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | adversely, with favorable Committee Substitute by the following |
---|
| 6 | + | vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 19, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
| 8 | + | COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 3735 By: Perry |
---|
4 | 12 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 13 | | relating to an application for a new or amended water right |
---|
6 | 14 | | submitted to the Texas Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
7 | 15 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 16 | | SECTION 1. Sections 11.002(1) and (3), Water Code, are |
---|
9 | 17 | | amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 18 | | (1) "Commission" means the Texas [Natural Resource |
---|
11 | 19 | | Conservation] Commission on Environmental Quality. |
---|
12 | 20 | | (3) "Executive director" means the executive director |
---|
13 | 21 | | of the Texas [Natural Resource Conservation] Commission on |
---|
14 | 22 | | Environmental Quality. |
---|
15 | 23 | | SECTION 2. Section 11.122, Water Code, is amended by adding |
---|
16 | 24 | | Subsections (b-1) and (b-2) to read as follows: |
---|
17 | 25 | | (b-1) A holder of a water right that begins using |
---|
18 | 26 | | desalinated seawater after acquiring the water right has a right to |
---|
19 | 27 | | expedited consideration of an application for an amendment to the |
---|
20 | 28 | | water right if the amendment: |
---|
21 | 29 | | (1) authorizes the applicant to divert water from a |
---|
22 | 30 | | diversion point that is different from or in addition to the point |
---|
23 | 31 | | or points from which the applicant was authorized to divert water |
---|
24 | 32 | | before the requested amendment; |
---|
25 | 33 | | (2) authorizes the applicant to divert from the |
---|
26 | 34 | | different or additional diversion point an amount of water that is |
---|
27 | 35 | | equal to or less than the amount of desalinated seawater used by the |
---|
28 | 36 | | applicant; |
---|
29 | 37 | | (3) authorizes the applicant to divert from all of the |
---|
30 | 38 | | diversion points authorized by the water right an amount of water |
---|
31 | 39 | | that is equal to or less than the amount of water the applicant was |
---|
32 | 40 | | authorized to divert under the water right before the requested |
---|
33 | 41 | | amendment; and |
---|
34 | 42 | | (4) does not authorize the water diverted from the |
---|
35 | 43 | | different or additional diversion point to be transferred to |
---|
36 | 44 | | another river basin. |
---|
37 | 45 | | (b-2) The executive director or the commission shall |
---|
38 | 46 | | prioritize the technical review of an application that is subject |
---|
39 | 47 | | to Subsection (b-1) over the technical review of applications that |
---|
40 | 48 | | are not subject to that subsection. |
---|
41 | 49 | | SECTION 3. Section 11.125(a), Water Code, is amended to |
---|
42 | 50 | | read as follows: |
---|
43 | 51 | | (a) The application must be accompanied by a map or plat in |
---|
44 | 52 | | the form and containing the information prescribed by the |
---|
45 | 53 | | commission [drawn on tracing linen on a scale not less than one inch |
---|
46 | 54 | | equals 2,000 feet]. |
---|
47 | 55 | | SECTION 4. Section 11.128, Water Code, is amended to read as |
---|
48 | 56 | | follows: |
---|
53 | 60 | | [5.701(c)] at the time [he files] the application is filed. The |
---|
54 | 61 | | commission may [shall] not record, file, or consider the |
---|
55 | 62 | | application until the executive director certifies to the |
---|
56 | 63 | | commission that the fee is paid. |
---|
57 | 64 | | SECTION 5. Section 11.134, Water Code, is amended by adding |
---|
58 | 65 | | Subsection (b-1) to read as follows: |
---|
59 | 66 | | (b-1) In determining whether an appropriation is |
---|
60 | 67 | | detrimental to the public welfare under Subsection (b)(3)(C), the |
---|
61 | 68 | | commission may consider only the factors that are within the |
---|
62 | 69 | | jurisdiction and expertise of the commission as established by this |
---|
63 | 70 | | chapter. |
---|
64 | 71 | | SECTION 6. Section 2003.047, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
65 | 72 | | amending Subsection (e-3) and adding Subsection (e-6) to read as |
---|
66 | 73 | | follows: |
---|
67 | 74 | | (e-3) The deadline specified by Subsection (e-2) or (e-6), |
---|
68 | 75 | | as applicable, may be extended: |
---|
69 | 76 | | (1) by agreement of the parties with the approval of |
---|
70 | 77 | | the administrative law judge; or |
---|
71 | 78 | | (2) by the administrative law judge if the judge |
---|
72 | 79 | | determines that failure to extend the deadline would unduly deprive |
---|
73 | 80 | | a party of due process or another constitutional right. |
---|
74 | 81 | | (e-6) For a matter pertaining to an application described by |
---|
75 | 82 | | Section 11.122(b-1), Water Code, the administrative law judge must |
---|
76 | 83 | | complete the proceeding and provide a proposal for decision to the |
---|
77 | 84 | | commission not later than the 270th day after the date the matter |
---|
78 | 85 | | was referred to the office. |
---|
79 | 86 | | SECTION 7. Sections 11.125(b) and (c), Water Code, are |
---|
80 | 87 | | repealed. |
---|
81 | 88 | | SECTION 8. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to |
---|
82 | 89 | | an application for a new or amended water right received by the |
---|
83 | 90 | | Texas Commission on Environmental Quality on or after the effective |
---|
84 | 91 | | date of this Act. An application received before the effective date |
---|
85 | 92 | | of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the date the |
---|
86 | 93 | | application was received, and the former law is continued in effect |
---|
87 | 94 | | for that purpose. |
---|
88 | 95 | | SECTION 9. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
89 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
90 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
91 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3735 was passed by the House on May |
---|
92 | | - | 12, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 138, Nays 5, 1 present, not |
---|
93 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
94 | | - | No. 3735 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 2, |
---|
95 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
96 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
97 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
98 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3735 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
99 | | - | amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
100 | | - | 0. |
---|
101 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
102 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
103 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
104 | | - | Date |
---|
105 | | - | __________________ |
---|
106 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 96 | + | * * * * * |
---|