Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3767 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2017

                            By: Allen (Senate Sponsor - Uresti) H.B. No. 3767
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
 May 12, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Education; May 22, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 22, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to annual reporting regarding the establishment of certain
 school district planning and decision-making committees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Section 11.251, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (h) to read as follows:
 (h)  The board shall annually certify to the agency in
 accordance with commissioner rule that the board has established
 the district- and campus-level committees as required by this
 section.
 SECTION 2.  This Act applies beginning with the 2017-2018
 school year.
 SECTION 3.  This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution.  If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *