House
|
05/12/2017
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3395
|
House
|
05/12/2017
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2885
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2017
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2017
|
Recommitted to committee
|
|
Journal Page: 2641
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2125
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
House
|
02/16/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 339
|
House
|
11/16/2016
|
Filed
|
|
|