Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3803 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 9, 2017

Engrossed

Bill May 2, 2017

Enrolled

Bill May 24, 2017

Comm Sub

Bill May 15, 2017
Bill April 25, 2017