Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB3810 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
1-H.B. No. 3810
1+By: Cyrier, Howard (Senate Sponsor - Watson) H.B. No. 3810
2+ (In the Senate - Received from the House May 10, 2017;
3+ May 10, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
4+ Administration; May 23, 2017, reported favorably, as amended, by
5+ the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 23, 2017, sent to printer.)
6+Click here to see the committee vote
27
38
9+ COMMITTEE AMENDMENT NO. 1 By: Burton
10+ Amend H.B. No. 3810 (House Engrossed version page 2, line 14) by
11+ inserting "parking facilities," between "staffing, " and
12+ "operation".
13+ A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
414 AN ACT
515 relating to the transfer of jurisdiction over and management of the
616 property known as the French Legation to the Texas Historical
717 Commission and to certain historic sites under the commission's
818 jurisdiction.
919 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1020 SECTION 1. Section 442.072(a), Government Code, is amended
1121 to read as follows:
1222 (a) The following historic sites and parks [formerly under
1323 the jurisdiction of the Parks and Wildlife Department] are under
1424 the commission's jurisdiction:
1525 (1) Acton State Historic Site;
1626 (2) Caddoan Mounds State Historic Site;
1727 (3) Casa Navarro State Historic Site;
1828 (4) Confederate Reunion Grounds State Historic Site;
1929 (5) Eisenhower Birthplace State Historic Site;
2030 (6) Fannin Battleground State Historic Site;
2131 (7) Fort Griffin State Historic Site;
2232 (8) Fort Lancaster State Historic Site;
2333 (9) Fort McKavett State Historic Site;
2434 (10) Fulton Mansion State Historic Site;
2535 (11) Landmark Inn State Historic Site;
2636 (12) Levi Jordan State Historic Site;
2737 (13) Magoffin Home State Historic Site;
2838 (14) Sabine Pass Battleground State Historic Site;
2939 (15) Sam Bell Maxey House State Historic Site;
3040 (16) San Felipe State Historic Site;
3141 (17) Starr Family Home State Historic Site;
3242 (18) Varner-Hogg Plantation State Historic Site;
3343 (19) Sam Rayburn House State Historic Site;
3444 (20) National Museum of the Pacific War;
3545 (21) the property known as the French Legation; and
3646 (22) Mission Dolores State Historic Site.
3747 SECTION 2. Subchapter C, Chapter 442, Government Code, is
3848 amended by adding Section 442.077 to read as follows:
3949 Sec. 442.077. AGREEMENT RELATING TO FRENCH LEGATION. The
4050 commission may enter into an agreement with the Daughters of the
41- Republic of Texas regarding the management, staffing, parking
42- facilities, operation, and financial support of the property known
43- as the French Legation.
51+ Republic of Texas regarding the management, staffing, operation,
52+ and financial support of the property known as the French Legation.
4453 SECTION 3. Section 2165.257, Government Code, is
4554 transferred to Subchapter C, Chapter 442, Government Code,
4655 redesignated as Section 442.076, Government Code, and amended to
4756 read as follows:
4857 Sec. 442.076 [2165.257]. FRENCH LEGATION [EMBASSY]. (a)
4958 The commission is responsible for:
5059 (1) the preservation, maintenance, and restoration of
5160 the [The] property known as the French Legation and its contents;
5261 and
5362 (2) the protection of the historical and architectural
5463 integrity of the exterior, interior, and grounds of the French
5564 Legation [Embassy is for the use and purposes of the Daughters of
5665 the Republic of Texas. They may take full charge of the building
5766 and use it as they consider proper].
5867 (b) Any power or duty related to the French Legation
5968 formerly vested in another state agency or entity is vested solely
6069 in the commission.
6170 (c) The commission may solicit and accept gifts, donations,
6271 and grants of money or property from any public or private source to
6372 be used for the purposes of this section.
6473 (d) In carrying out the commission's responsibilities under
6574 this section during the state fiscal biennium ending August 31,
6675 2019, the commission may use only money or property received as a
6776 gift, donation, or grant from a public or private source. This
6877 subsection expires September 1, 2019 [The French Embassy is the
6978 property of the state, and title to the property remains in the
7079 commission's custody].
7180 SECTION 4. The heading to Section 2203.003, Government
7281 Code, is amended to read as follows:
7382 Sec. 2203.003. STATE PROPERTY UNDER CONTROL OF THE TEXAS
7483 DIVISION UNITED DAUGHTERS OF THE CONFEDERACY[, TEXAS DIVISION, AND
7584 THE DAUGHTERS OF THE REPUBLIC OF TEXAS].
7685 SECTION 5. Section 2203.003(a), Government Code, is amended
7786 to read as follows:
7887 (a) The Texas Division United Daughters of the
7988 Confederacy[, Texas Division, and the Daughters of the Republic of
8089 Texas each] may charge admission to state property over which the
8190 [each] organization has custody or control.
8291 SECTION 6. (a) On September 1, 2017, or as soon as
8392 practicable after that date, the Daughters of the Republic of Texas
8493 with assistance from the Texas Facilities Commission shall take a
8594 complete inventory of all personal property and fixtures located at
8695 the property known as the French Legation. The inventory must
8796 identify the origin of each item and its current owner as agreed to
8897 between the Daughters of the Republic of Texas and the Texas
8998 Facilities Commission. The Daughters of the Republic of Texas shall
9099 be allowed a reasonable time after completion of the inventory to
91100 remove any personal property and fixtures owned by the
92101 organization.
93102 (b) Any dispute regarding the ownership of personal
94103 property and fixtures located at the French Legation shall be
95104 resolved through alternative dispute resolution as provided by
96105 Chapter 2009, Government Code.
97106 (c) The Daughters of the Republic of Texas may transfer any
98107 property of the organization described by this section to the Texas
99108 Historical Commission.
100109 SECTION 7. On September 1, 2017, the following are
101110 transferred to the Texas Historical Commission:
102111 (1) all powers and duties of the Daughters of the
103112 Republic of Texas relating to the property known as the French
104113 Legation;
105114 (2) all state-owned assets in the possession of the
106115 Daughters of the Republic of Texas relating to the French Legation;
107116 and
108117 (3) all files and other records of the Daughters of the
109118 Republic of Texas kept by the organization regarding the French
110119 Legation.
111120 SECTION 8. On September 1, 2017, the following are
112121 transferred to the Texas Historical Commission:
113122 (1) all powers and duties of the Texas Facilities
114123 Commission relating to the property known as the French Legation
115124 and its grounds;
116125 (2) all files and other records of the Texas
117126 Facilities Commission relating to the French Legation;
118127 (3) all contracts of the Texas Facilities Commission
119128 pertaining specifically to the French Legation and its grounds; and
120129 (4) all funds appropriated to the Texas Facilities
121130 Commission designated for the benefit of the French Legation.
122131 SECTION 9. On September 1, 2017, the Daughters of the
123132 Republic of Texas shall transfer any money held in trust by the
124133 organization under Section 2203.003, Government Code, as amended by
125134 this Act, in relation to the property known as the French Legation
126135 to the Texas Historical Commission to be held in trust by the
127136 commission for the purposes described by Section 442.076,
128137 Government Code, as redesignated and amended by this Act.
129138 SECTION 10. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
130- ______________________________ ______________________________
131- President of the Senate Speaker of the House
132- I certify that H.B. No. 3810 was passed by the House on May 9,
133- 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 136, Nays 7, 2 present, not
134- voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
135- No. 3810 on May 26, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 140, Nays 5,
136- 1 present, not voting.
137- ______________________________
138- Chief Clerk of the House
139- I certify that H.B. No. 3810 was passed by the Senate, with
140- amendments, on May 24, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 3
141- 0, Nays
142- 1.
143- ______________________________
144- Secretary of the Senate
145- APPROVED: __________________
146- Date
147- __________________
148- Governor
139+ * * * * *