1 | | - | H.B. No. 3903 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Burkett (Senate Sponsor - Huffman) H.B. No. 3903 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 5, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on State |
---|
| 4 | + | Affairs; May 15, 2017, reported favorably by the following vote: |
---|
| 5 | + | Yeas 7, Nays 2; May 15, 2017, sent to printer.) |
---|
| 6 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 10 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 11 | | relating to certain political contributions by judicial candidates |
---|
6 | 12 | | and officeholders and certain political committees. |
---|
7 | 13 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 14 | | SECTION 1. Section 253.1611, Election Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 15 | | amending Subsection (e) and adding Subsection (e-1) to read as |
---|
10 | 16 | | follows: |
---|
11 | 17 | | (e) This section does not apply to a political contribution |
---|
12 | 18 | | made to the principal political committee of the state executive |
---|
13 | | - | committee or a county executive committee of a political party that |
---|
14 | | - | provides [: |
---|
15 | | - | [(1) is made in return for] goods or services, |
---|
16 | | - | including political advertising or a campaign communication, to or |
---|
17 | | - | for the benefit of judicial candidates [the value of which |
---|
18 | | - | substantially equals or exceeds the amount of the contribution; or |
---|
| 19 | + | committee or a county executive committee of a political party |
---|
| 20 | + | [that: |
---|
| 21 | + | [(1) is made in return for goods or services, |
---|
| 22 | + | including political advertising or a campaign communication, the |
---|
| 23 | + | value of which substantially equals or exceeds the amount of the |
---|
| 24 | + | contribution; or |
---|
27 | 32 | | (1) an organization that has been designated as an |
---|
28 | 33 | | auxiliary, coalition, or county chair association of a political |
---|
29 | 34 | | party as provided by political party rule or state executive |
---|
30 | 35 | | committee bylaw; or |
---|
31 | 36 | | (2) a local chapter of an organization described by |
---|
32 | 37 | | Subdivision (1). |
---|
33 | 38 | | SECTION 2. Section 253.1611(f), Election Code, is repealed. |
---|
34 | 39 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
35 | 40 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
36 | 41 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
37 | 42 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
38 | 43 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3903 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
42 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 107, Nays 40, 1 present, not |
---|
43 | | - | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
44 | | - | No. 3903 on May 20, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 122, Nays 11, |
---|
45 | | - | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
46 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
48 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3903 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
49 | | - | amendments, on May 19, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
50 | | - | 0. |
---|
51 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
52 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
53 | | - | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
54 | | - | Date |
---|
55 | | - | __________________ |
---|
56 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 44 | + | * * * * * |
---|