House | 05/02/2017 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 05/02/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Posting rule suspended | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Referred to County Affairs | ||
House | 04/04/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed |