Texas 2017 - 85th Regular

Texas House Bill HB394 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/02/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Howard, Workman, Alonzo H.B. No. 394
 (Senate Sponsor - Watson)
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 18, 2017;
 April 19, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 9, 2017, reported favorably by the following
 vote:  Yeas 6, Nays 0; May 9, 2017, sent to printer.)
Click here to see the committee vote


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the designation of the Lady Bird Johnson Wildflower
 Center at The University of Texas at Austin as the state botanical
 garden and arboretum.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1.  Chapter 3101, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Section 3101.013 to read as follows:
 Sec. 3101.013.  STATE BOTANICAL GARDEN AND ARBORETUM. The
 state botanical garden and arboretum is the Lady Bird Johnson
 Wildflower Center at The University of Texas at Austin.
 SECTION 2.  This Act takes effect September 1, 2017.
 * * * * *