1 | | - | H.B. No. 3952 |
---|
| 1 | + | By: Phillips (Senate Sponsor - Perry) H.B. No. 3952 |
---|
| 2 | + | (In the Senate - Received from the House May 5, 2017; |
---|
| 3 | + | May 8, 2017, read first time and referred to Committee on |
---|
| 4 | + | Agriculture, Water & Rural Affairs; May 16, 2017, reported |
---|
| 5 | + | favorably by the following vote: Yeas 7, Nays 0; May 16, 2017, |
---|
| 6 | + | sent to printer.) |
---|
| 7 | + | Click here to see the committee vote |
---|
4 | 11 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 12 | | relating to suspension of the activities of the Texas Grain |
---|
6 | 13 | | Producer Indemnity Board. |
---|
7 | 14 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 15 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter G, Chapter 41, Agriculture Code, is |
---|
9 | 16 | | amended by adding Section 41.128 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 17 | | Sec. 41.128. TEXAS GRAIN PRODUCER INDEMNITY BOARD. (a) The |
---|
11 | 18 | | Texas Grain Producer Indemnity Board is not abolished but is |
---|
12 | 19 | | inactive as provided by this section until reactivated under |
---|
13 | 20 | | Subsection (d). |
---|
14 | 21 | | (b) The terms of office of the members of the Texas Grain |
---|
15 | 22 | | Producer Indemnity Board expire, as determined by the commissioner, |
---|
16 | 23 | | on December 31, 2017, or when the board files the report under |
---|
17 | 24 | | Section 41.059(c) for the board's fiscal year that includes |
---|
18 | 25 | | September 1, 2017. That report is the board's final report unless |
---|
19 | 26 | | the board is reactivated under Subsection (d). |
---|
20 | 27 | | (c) While the board is inactive, the department shall |
---|
21 | 28 | | administer the grain producer indemnity fund. From money available |
---|
22 | 29 | | in the fund, the department shall pay all or part of any claims |
---|
23 | 30 | | under Subchapter I that the department determines are valid. When |
---|
24 | 31 | | the department determines that no potential claims remain, the |
---|
25 | 32 | | department shall refund any money remaining in the fund to grain |
---|
26 | 33 | | producers who paid an assessment under Section 41.206 on a pro rata |
---|
27 | 34 | | basis. |
---|
28 | 35 | | (d) The commissioner shall order the reactivation of the |
---|
29 | 36 | | Texas Grain Producer Indemnity Board if at least 200 grain |
---|
30 | 37 | | producers petition the commissioner to reactivate the board. If |
---|
31 | 38 | | the board is reactivated, the commissioner shall appoint board |
---|
32 | 39 | | members as provided by Section 41.204. |
---|
33 | 40 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2017. |
---|
34 | | - | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
35 | | - | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
36 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3952 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
37 | | - | 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 0, 2 present, not |
---|
38 | | - | voting. |
---|
39 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
40 | | - | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
41 | | - | I certify that H.B. No. 3952 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
42 | | - | 22, 2017, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
43 | | - | ______________________________ |
---|
44 | | - | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
45 | | - | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
46 | | - | Date |
---|
47 | | - | _____________________ |
---|
48 | | - | Governor |
---|
| 41 | + | * * * * * |
---|