E
|
05/31/2017
|
See remarks for effective date
|
|
|
E
|
05/31/2017
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6064
|
E
|
05/30/2017
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6062
|
Senate
|
05/29/2017
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4237
|
House
|
05/28/2017
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6032
|
House
|
05/27/2017
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 3290
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#1819
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
House
|
05/25/2017
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 4872
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2017
|
Senate Amendments distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2017
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4358
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
FA3 Taylor of Collin
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2468
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
FA4 Uresti
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
FA3 Taylor of Collin
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2467
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2466
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2465
|
Senate
|
05/22/2017
|
Co-sponsor authorized
|
|
Journal Page: 2571
|
Senate
|
05/19/2017
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2072
|
Senate
|
05/10/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/28/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 745
|
Senate
|
03/06/2017
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 398
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 571
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 536
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#58
|
Journal Page: 535
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
House
|
03/02/2017
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 535
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Reason for vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 523
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#55
|
Journal Page: 522
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 522
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment as amended withdrawn
|
11-Keough
|
Journal Page: 522
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment amended
|
12-Wu
|
Journal Page: 519
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Point of order overruled (amendment)
|
Rule 11, Section 2 and Rule 11, Section 3
|
Journal Page: 518
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment to amendment offered
|
12-Wu
|
Journal Page: 518
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
11-Keough
|
Journal Page: 518
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amended
|
10-Minjarez
|
Journal Page: 517
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment tabled
|
9-Moody
|
Journal Page: 516
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment adopted as amended
|
7-Dutton
|
Journal Page: 516
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment as amended tabled
|
5-Stickland
|
Journal Page: 514
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Amendment withdrawn
|
4-Howard
|
Journal Page: 514
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 512
|
House
|
03/01/2017
|
Placed on Emergency Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Record vote
|
RV#45
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
02/27/2017
|
Calendars Committee rule adopted
|
|
Journal Page: 465
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 461
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
02/20/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Referred to Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 274
|
House
|
02/13/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 274
|
House
|
02/10/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|