House | 05/10/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Record vote | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Failed to pass to engrossment | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Amended | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Point of order overruled | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Point of order withdrawn | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | ||
House | 05/10/2017 | Postponed | ||
House | 05/08/2017 | Read 2nd time | ||
House | 05/05/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/03/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 04/26/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/25/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/24/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Referred to Business & Industry | ||
House | 03/31/2017 | Read first time | ||
House | 03/10/2017 | Filed |