Senate | 05/10/2017 | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 05/10/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1796 | |
Senate | 04/10/2017 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 936 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1431 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Record vote | RV#158 | Journal Page: 1130 |
House | 04/06/2017 | Passed | Journal Page: 1130 | |
House | 04/06/2017 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1129 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1102 | |
House | 04/05/2017 | Amendment adopted as amended | 7-Leach | Journal Page: 1102 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Amendment amended | 8-Howard, E. Rodriguez, and Israel | Journal Page: 1102 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 7-Leach | Journal Page: 1102 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Amendment tabled | 6-Reynolds | Journal Page: 1102 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Amended | 5-Pickett | Journal Page: 1101 |
House | 04/05/2017 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 1100 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Postponed | 4/5/17 12:00 PM | Journal Page: 1076 |
House | 04/04/2017 | Amendment withdrawn | 1-Rinaldi, et al. | Journal Page: 1076 |
House | 04/04/2017 | Amendment to amendment withdrawn | 3-Fallon | Journal Page: 1076 |
House | 04/04/2017 | Vote reconsidered | Journal Page: 1076 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Amendment amended | 2-Leach | Journal Page: 1075 |
House | 04/04/2017 | Amendment(s) offered | 1-Rinaldi, Villalba, Koop, R. Anderson, Burkett, Meyer, and Button | Journal Page: 1075 |
House | 04/04/2017 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1075 | |
House | 04/04/2017 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 03/29/2017 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Committee report distributed | ||
House | 03/22/2017 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 837 | |
House | 03/15/2017 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/15/2017 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/14/2017 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 02/16/2017 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 02/16/2017 | Read first time | Journal Page: 341 | |
House | 11/17/2016 | Filed |