House
|
05/09/2017
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2017
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2017
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Transferred to Calendars Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2017
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Committee report distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2017
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2017
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2017
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Referred to Texas Ports, Innovation & Infrastructure, Select
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2017
|
Read first time
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2017
|
Filed
|
|
|